MN HF4713 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-11 - Joint rule 2.03 waived
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-11 - Joint rule 2.03 waived
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commissioner of labor and industry required to adopt rules related to acceptable blood lead levels for workers.
Title
Commissioner of labor and industry required to adopt rules related to acceptable blood lead levels for workers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2024-04-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy |
2024-04-08 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2024-04-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy |
2024-03-18 | House | Author added Virnig |
2024-03-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor and Industry Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4600 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance