MN HF4687 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-11 - Author stricken Gillman
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-11 - Author stricken Gillman
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Harmful atmospheric activity prohibited, and penalties provided.
Title
Harmful atmospheric activity prohibited, and penalties provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Author stricken Gillman |
2024-04-02 | House | Author added Knudsen |
2024-03-20 | House | Author added Gillman |
2024-03-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4630 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Author stricken Eichorn