MN HF4670 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Secretary of State Chapter 88
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Secretary of State Chapter 88
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Claims against the state; providing for the settlement of exoneration awards, and money appropriated.
Title
Claims against the state; providing for the settlement of exoneration awards, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - House: Passage (Y: 83 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - House: Passage (Y: 83 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Secretary of State Chapter 88 | |
2022-06-02 | Governor's action Approval | |
2022-06-02 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2022-06-02 | Governor approval | |
2022-05-24 | Presented to Governor | |
2022-05-21 | House | Returned from Senate |
2022-05-21 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2022-05-21 | Senate | Special Order |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Received from House |
2022-05-12 | House | Bill was passed |
2022-05-12 | House | Third reading |
2022-05-11 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 12, 2022 |
2022-05-05 | House | Second reading |
2022-05-05 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2022-03-30 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF4339 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Referred to Finance