MN HF460 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-7)
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Governor's action Veto Chapter 47
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Governor's action Veto Chapter 47
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Fire Code; sprinkler requirements prohibited in single-family dwellings, and licensee offer of option to install fire sprinklers required before entering into a written contract.
Title
State Fire Code; sprinkler requirements prohibited in single-family dwellings, and licensee offer of option to install fire sprinklers required before entering into a written contract.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - House - Repassage, as amended by the Senate (Y: 97 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - Passage (Y: 90 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - Passage (Y: 90 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Governor's action Veto Chapter 47 | |
2011-05-21 | Presented to Governor | |
2011-05-19 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 97-36 |
2011-05-19 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2011-05-19 | House | Motion prevailed |
2011-05-19 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2011-05-19 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2011-05-19 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Calendar: Third reading Passed vote: 50-15 |
2011-05-14 | Senate | General Orders: To pass as amended vote: 41-19 |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2011-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2011-04-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2011-04-04 | Senate | Received from House |
2011-03-31 | House | Bill was passed vote: 90-40 |
2011-03-31 | House | Third reading |
2011-03-24 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2011-03-21 | House | Author added Dill |
2011-03-07 | House | Second reading |
2011-03-07 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2011-02-28 | House | Author added Daudt |
2011-02-24 | House | Author added Murdock |
2011-02-17 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2011-02-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |