MN HF4514 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Author added Sencer-Mura
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Author added Sencer-Mura
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commissioner of human services directed to develop covered benefit for integrated health services, demonstration project created, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Commissioner of human services directed to develop covered benefit for integrated health services, demonstration project created, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] | Rep. Jeff Brand [D] | Rep. Larry Kraft [D] | Rep. Natalie Zeleznikar [R] |
Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Samantha Sencer-Mura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Author added Sencer-Mura |
2024-03-18 | House | Author added Fischer |
2024-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy |
2024-03-13 | House | Author added Zeleznikar |
2024-03-07 | House | Authors added Brand and Kraft |
2024-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF4447 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Author added Latz