MN HF450 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Secretary of State Chapter 21 04/24/13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Secretary of State Chapter 21 04/24/13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Actions for damages based on services or construction to improve real property limitations modified.
Title
Actions for damages based on services or construction to improve real property limitations modified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - House: Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Secretary of State Chapter 21 04/24/13 | |
2013-04-24 | Governor's action Approval | |
2013-04-24 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2013-04-24 | Governor approval | |
2013-04-22 | Presented to Governor | |
2013-04-20 | House | Returned from Senate |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 64-0 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Special Order |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Second reading |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF392 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF392, now on General Orders |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-04-16 | House | Bill was passed vote: 131-0 |
2013-04-16 | House | Third reading |
2013-04-11 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, April 16, 2013 |
2013-03-11 | House | Second reading |
2013-03-11 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2013-02-21 | House | Author added FitzSimmons |
2013-02-20 | House | Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Policy |
2013-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law |