MN HF446 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-23 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-23 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax dependency exemption allocation allowed in child support matters.
Title
Income tax dependency exemption allocation allowed in child support matters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | Second reading |
2015-03-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2015-03-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance |
2015-02-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law and Data Practices |
Same As/Similar To
SF848 (Similar To) 2015-04-07 - Second reading