MN HF4451 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Author added Mueller
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Author added Mueller
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Purple Star School designation established.
Title
Purple Star School designation established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Author added Mueller |
2024-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Policy |
2024-03-04 | House | Author added Scott |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4561 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Referred to Education Policy