MN HF4411 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 1:00 pm Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 1:00 pm Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Elections, campaign finance, and secretary of state funding provided and policy modified; local ranked choice voting provisions established; voting rights act cost sharing account established; transfer and appropriations modified; rulemaking authorized; and money appropriated.
Title
Elections, campaign finance, and secretary of state funding provided and policy modified; local ranked choice voting provisions established; voting rights act cost sharing account established; transfer and appropriations modified; rulemaking authorized; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2024-04-04 | House | Author changed Freiberg as chief author |
2024-03-07 | House | Author added Frederick |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Elections Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4260 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Second reading