MN HF4328 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-19 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Omnibus education finance bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus education finance bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - House - House: Amendment to Loon Amendment (Y: 0 N: 125 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-26 - House - House: Passage (Y: 94 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 44 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-26 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 74 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 76 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-19SenateSecond reading
2018-05-19SenateWithdrawn Finance
2018-04-30SenateReferred to Finance
2018-04-30SenateIntroduction and first reading
2018-04-30SenateReceived from House
2018-04-26HouseBill was passed as amended vote: 94-29
2018-04-26HouseThird reading as amended
2018-04-26HouseAmended
2018-04-24HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 26, 2018
2018-04-24HouseSecond reading
2018-04-24HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2018-04-23HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2018-04-19HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes
2018-04-12HouseAuthor added Erickson.
2018-04-09HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance

Same As/Similar To

SF3928 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF4328&ssn=0&y=2017
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF4328&version=0&session=ls90&session_year=2018&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF4328&version=1&session=ls90&session_year=2018&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF4328&version=2&session=ls90&session_year=2018&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF4328&version=3&session=ls90&session_year=2018&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF4328&session_number=0&year=2017&id=434
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF4328&session_number=0&year=2017&id=435
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF4328&session_number=0&year=2017&id=436
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF4328&session_number=0&year=2017&id=438
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF4328&session_number=0&year=2017&id=437

Bill Comments

feedback