MN HF4292 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Author added Gomez
Pending: House Climate and Energy Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Author added Gomez
Pending: House Climate and Energy Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Utility expenses that may not be recovered from ratepayers specified.
Title
Utility expenses that may not be recovered from ratepayers specified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Author added Gomez |
2024-03-25 | House | Author added Sencer-Mura |
2024-03-20 | House | Author added Xiong |
2024-03-14 | House | Author added Hanson, J., |
2024-02-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Climate and Energy Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4426 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Referred to Energy, Utilities, Environment, and Climate