MN HF4278 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Author added Olson, L.
Pending: House Workforce and Business Development Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Author added Olson, L.
Pending: House Workforce and Business Development Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Early childhood education workforce funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Early childhood education workforce funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | House | Author added Olson, L. |
2022-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Workforce and Business Development Finance and Policy |
2022-03-17 | House | Author added Boldon |
2022-03-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Early Childhood Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3986 (Similar To) 2022-04-06 - Author added Putnam