MN HF4276 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-25 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-25 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revisor of statutes directed to update terms used in statute.
Title
Revisor of statutes directed to update terms used in statute.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Second reading |
2024-03-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2024-03-04 | House | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2024-02-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
Same As/Similar To
SF4394 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety