MN HF4247 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-19 - Bill was repassed as amended by Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-19 - Bill was repassed as amended by Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Transfer care specialist registration established, behavior analysts licensure established, veterinary technician and veterinary institutional license established, veterinary supervision provisions modified, specialty dentist licensure and dental assistant licensure modified, physician assistant additional collaboration requirements removed, social worker provisional licensure modified, guest licensure established for marriage and family therapists, pharmacy provisions modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Transfer care specialist registration established, behavior analysts licensure established, veterinary technician and veterinary institutional license established, veterinary supervision provisions modified, specialty dentist licensure and dental assistant licensure modified, physician assistant additional collaboration requirements removed, social worker provisional licensure modified, guest licensure established for marriage and family therapists, pharmacy provisions modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-19 - House - House: H.F. NO. 4247 (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 92 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - House - House: Shall the decision of the Speaker stand as the judgment of the House? (Y: 66 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - House - House: Shall the decision of the Speaker stand as the judgment of the House? (Y: 68 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 92 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - House - House: Shall the decision of the Speaker stand as the judgment of the House? (Y: 66 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - House - House: Shall the decision of the Speaker stand as the judgment of the House? (Y: 68 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-19 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference |
2024-05-19 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2024-05-19 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2024-05-19 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Senate conferees Wiklund; Boldon; Utke |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed |
2024-05-09 | Senate | House conferees Liebling; Carroll; Nadeau |
2024-05-09 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2024-05-09 | House | Senate conferees Wiklund, Boldon, and Utke |
2024-05-09 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed |
2024-05-07 | House | House conferees Liebling, Carroll, Nadeau |
2024-05-07 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2024-05-07 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Special Order |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Referred to State and Local Government and Veterans |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Received from House |
2024-04-29 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2024-04-29 | House | Third reading as amended |
2024-04-29 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken |
2024-04-29 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken |
2024-04-29 | House | Amended |
2024-04-26 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 29, 2024 |
2024-04-04 | House | Second reading |
2024-04-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2024-04-02 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2024-03-21 | House | Author added Xiong |
2024-02-28 | House | Author added Liebling added as chief author |
2024-02-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4570 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt rule 2.03 suspended