MN HF423 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Author added Urdahl
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Greater Minnesota child care facility grant program funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Greater Minnesota child care facility grant program funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseAuthor added Urdahl
2019-03-14HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-02-25HouseReferred by Chair to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division
2019-02-14HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-02-14HouseRecalled by Chair Ways and Means
2019-02-11HouseAuthor added Kunesh-Podein
2019-02-04HouseAuthor added Huot
2019-01-31HouseAuthor added Theis
2019-01-28HouseReferred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division
2019-01-28HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF538 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Capital Investment

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback