MN HF4189 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Author added Grossell
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Author added Grossell
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Legislative approval required to extend a declared emergency beyond five days, citizen rights protected, legislative enactment required before executive orders and rules may have the force and effect of law, terms defined, and criminal penalties repealed.
Title
Legislative approval required to extend a declared emergency beyond five days, citizen rights protected, legislative enactment required before executive orders and rules may have the force and effect of law, terms defined, and criminal penalties repealed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Author added Grossell |
2022-03-30 | House | Author added Haley |
2022-03-28 | House | Author added Jurgens |
2022-03-17 | House | Author added Hertaus |
2022-03-14 | House | Authors added Mueller, McDonald, Davids, Poston, and Akland |
2022-03-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
Same As/Similar To
SF3860 (Similar To) 2022-03-23 - Author added Dornink