MN HF4171 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency medical services task force established, task force and grant program funding provided to promote volunteer retention, and money appropriated.
Title
Emergency medical services task force established, task force and grant program funding provided to promote volunteer retention, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Laurie Pryor [D] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] | Rep. John Poston [R] |
Rep. Liz Olson [D] | Rep. Paul Marquart [D] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Ami Wazlawik [D] |
Rep. Jeff Brand [D] | Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] | Rep. Duane Quam [R] | Rep. Dave Lislegard [D] |
Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy |
2020-03-09 | House | Author added Becker-Finn |
2020-03-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF4266 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy