MN HF4159 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Author added Omar.
Pending: House Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Juvenile detention alternatives funding provided, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile detention alternatives funding provided, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16HouseAuthor added Omar.
2018-04-09HouseAuthors added Fabian and Ward.
2018-03-29HouseAuthor added Ecklund.
2018-03-28HouseAuthor added Dehn, R.
2018-03-26HouseAuthor added Lueck
2018-03-22HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance

Same As/Similar To

SF3776 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Author added Dziedzic

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback