MN HF4147 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - Author added Newberger.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - Author added Newberger.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CLUES Education and Technology Institute construction funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
CLUES Education and Technology Institute construction funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | House | Author added Newberger. |
2018-03-28 | House | Author added Dehn, R. |
2018-03-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF3714 (Similar To) 2018-03-21 - Referred to Capital Investment