MN HF4132 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-10 - Author added Franke.
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-10 - Author added Franke.
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Women's Suffrage 100th Anniversary Commemoration Commission established, and money appropriated.
Title
Women's Suffrage 100th Anniversary Commemoration Commission established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Author added Franke. |
2018-04-12 | House | Author added Omar. |
2018-03-26 | House | Author added Maye Quade |
2018-03-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance |
2018-03-22 | House | Authors added Ward, Fenton, Youakim, Masin, and Anselmo. |
2018-03-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3547 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections