MN HF4099 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus supplemental budget bill.
Title
Omnibus supplemental budget bill.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2018-05-01 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2018-04-30 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF3656 |
2018-04-30 | House | Second reading |
2018-04-30 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2018-03-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF3656 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Secretary of State, Filed