MN HF4083 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Author added Poston
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Author added Poston
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Sentencing Guidelines Commission eliminated, and Minnesota Sentencing Data Office established.
Title
Minnesota Sentencing Guidelines Commission eliminated, and Minnesota Sentencing Data Office established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Author added Poston |
2022-03-10 | House | Author added Johnson |
2022-03-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2882 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy