MN HF4049 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Identification cards provided for offenders released from incarceration.
Title
Identification cards provided for offenders released from incarceration.
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Tabke [D] | Rep. Jamie Long [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2020-03-11 | House | Author added Long |
2020-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF4042 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy