MN HF4 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - Committee report, without further rec to amend, re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - Committee report, without further rec to amend, re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Drug manufacturer or wholesale distributor prohibited from charging unconscionable prices for prescription drugs; Board of Pharmacy, commissioner of human services, and health plan companies required to notify the attorney general of certain prescription drug price increases; attorney general authorized to take action against drug manufacturers and wholesalers related to price increases; civil penalties imposed; and money appropriated.
Title
Drug manufacturer or wholesale distributor prohibited from charging unconscionable prices for prescription drugs; Board of Pharmacy, commissioner of human services, and health plan companies required to notify the attorney general of certain prescription drug price increases; attorney general authorized to take action against drug manufacturers and wholesalers related to price increases; civil penalties imposed; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | House | Committee report, without further rec to amend, re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-03-11 | House | Committee report, without further rec to amend, re-refer to State Government Finance Division |
2020-02-27 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-04-03 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion did not prevail State Government Finance Division |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-02-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce |
2019-01-14 | House | Author added Mariani |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1518 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy