MN HF4 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Motion to recall and re-refer, motion did not prevail State Government Finance Division
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Drug manufacturer or distributor prohibited from charging unconscionable prices for prescription drugs; Board of Pharmacy, commissioner of human services, and health plan companies required to notify the attorney general of certain prescription drug price increases; attorney general authorized to take action against drug manufacturers and wholesalers related to price increases; and civil penalties imposed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drug manufacturer or distributor prohibited from charging unconscionable prices for prescription drugs; Board of Pharmacy, commissioner of human services, and health plan companies required to notify the attorney general of certain prescription drug price increases; attorney general authorized to take action against drug manufacturers and wholesalers related to price increases; and civil penalties imposed.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseMotion to recall and re-refer, motion did not prevail State Government Finance Division
2019-03-04HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-04HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-02-21HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
2019-02-07HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce
2019-01-14HouseAuthor added Mariani
2019-01-10HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1518 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback