MN HF3971 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-28 - Author added Haley
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-28 - Author added Haley
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Advisory Council on Water Supply Systems and Wastewater Treatment Facilities reestablished, drinking water infrastructure improvement funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Advisory Council on Water Supply Systems and Wastewater Treatment Facilities reestablished, drinking water infrastructure improvement funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Torkelson [R] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Joshua Heintzeman [R] | Rep. Todd Lippert [D] |
Rep. Barb Haley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-28 | House | Author added Haley |
2020-03-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Water Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF4430 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance