MN HF3935 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Author added Christensen.
Pending: House Transportation and Regional Governance Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Author added Christensen.
Pending: House Transportation and Regional Governance Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
DUI; lifetime revocation of licenses and permits to drive for repeat offenders, and reinstatement process created.
Title
DUI; lifetime revocation of licenses and permits to drive for repeat offenders, and reinstatement process created.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Author added Christensen. |
2018-03-19 | House | Author added Lillie. |
2018-03-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation and Regional Governance Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3685 (Similar To) 2018-03-21 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy