MN HF3893 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Author added Scott
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Author added Scott
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Courts prohibited from sentencing without regard to mandatory minimum sentence applicable to designated crimes involving firearms or dangerous weapons.
Title
Courts prohibited from sentencing without regard to mandatory minimum sentence applicable to designated crimes involving firearms or dangerous weapons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Author added Scott |
2022-03-10 | House | Author added Poston |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2576 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Authors added Howe; Kiffmeyer; Limmer; Housley