MN HF3874 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Administrative penalty order authority modified for enforcing public water and drainage dich buffer requirements, and certain lawns to legumes program data made private.
Title
Administrative penalty order authority modified for enforcing public water and drainage dich buffer requirements, and certain lawns to legumes program data made private.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] | Rep. Leigh Finke [D] |
Rep. Bianca Virnig [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
2024-02-29 | House | Authors added Fischer, Jordan, Finke, and Virnig |
2024-02-29 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3867 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration