MN HF3845 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 63
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 63
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Office of the Foster Youth Ombudsperson and Board of the Foster Youth Ombudsperson established, and money appropriated.
Title
Office of the Foster Youth Ombudsperson and Board of the Foster Youth Ombudsperson established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - House - House: H.F. NO. 3845 (Y: 127 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Repassed (Y: 57 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 121 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Repassed (Y: 57 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 121 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Secretary of State Chapter 63 | |
2022-05-19 | Governor's action Approval | |
2022-05-19 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2022-05-19 | Governor approval | |
2022-05-17 | Presented to Governor | |
2022-05-16 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate |
2022-05-16 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2022-05-16 | House | Motion prevailed |
2022-05-16 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2022-05-16 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2022-05-12 | House | House rule 1.15 (c), message requesting concurrence received |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Third Reading Repassed |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Special Order |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF4209 |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF4209, now on General Orders |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Received from House |
2022-05-09 | House | Author added Kotyza-Witthuhn |
2022-05-06 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2022-05-06 | House | Third reading as amended |
2022-05-06 | House | Amended |
2022-05-05 | House | Authors added Klevorn, Albright, Nash, Johnson |
2022-05-04 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 6, 2022 |
2022-04-29 | House | Second reading |
2022-04-29 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2022-04-04 | House | Author added Keeler |
2022-03-30 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2022-03-24 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2022-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Human Services Finance and Policy |
2022-03-07 | House | Author added Fischer |
2022-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF4209 (Similar To) 2022-05-10 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3845