MN HF3820 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Metropolitan area definition expanded for 911 emergency service purposes.
Title
Metropolitan area definition expanded for 911 emergency service purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Shane Mekeland [R] | Rep. Anne Neu Brindley [R] | Rep. Brian Johnson [R] | Rep. Paul Novotny [R] |
Rep. Sondra Erickson [R] | Rep. Matthew Grossell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Second reading |
2020-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-03-04 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2020-02-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF3436 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy