MN HF3787 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Watercraft operator safety education and permitting required, motorboat rental requirements established, and money appropriated.
Title
Watercraft operator safety education and permitting required, motorboat rental requirements established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Erin Koegel [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] |
Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Sen. Kelly Morrison [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] |
Rep. Heather Keeler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2022-03-14 | House | Authors added Huot, Freiberg, and Keeler |
2022-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2022-03-10 | House | Author added Morrison |
2022-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3392 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Author added Housley