MN SF3392 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Author added Housley
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Author added Housley
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Safety education and permitting requirement for certain watercraft operators; Certain obligations requirements on motorboat rental businesses
Title
Safety education and permitting requirement for certain watercraft operators; Certain obligations requirements on motorboat rental businesses
Sponsors
Sen. Caroline Ruud [R] | Sen. William Ingebrigtsen [R] | Sen. David Osmek [R] | Sen. Foung Hawj [D] |
Sen. Karin Housley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Author added Housley |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Author stricken Utke |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3787 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means