MN HF373 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Author added Robbins
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Female genital mutilation crime expanded, education and outreach requirements updated, and egregious definition expanded.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Female genital mutilation crime expanded, education and outreach requirements updated, and egregious definition expanded.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseAuthor added Robbins
2019-03-27HouseAuthor added Bahr
2019-02-21HouseAuthor added Dettmer
2019-02-04HouseAuthors added Heintzeman, Drazkowski, Koznick, and Fabian.
2019-01-31HouseMotion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
2019-01-31HouseAuthors added Lucero, Daudt, Bennett, Gruenhagen, Garofalo, Runbeck, Nornes
2019-01-24HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback