MN HF3719 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - Author added Her
Pending: House Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - Author added Her
Pending: House Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Soil and water conservation district aid program established, and money appropriated.
Title
Soil and water conservation district aid program established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | House | Author added Her |
2022-03-31 | House | Author added Raleigh |
2022-03-30 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2022-03-23 | House | Author added Boe |
2022-03-21 | House | Author added Fischer |
2022-03-10 | House | Authors added Hamilton and Stephenson |
2022-03-07 | House | Authors added Masin and Torkelson |
2022-03-03 | House | Authors added Olson, L., and Anderson |
2022-02-28 | House | Author added Marquart |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred by Chair to Property Tax Division |
2022-02-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF3913 (Similar To) 2022-03-16 - Authors added Rarick; Putnam