MN HF3703 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Author added Schomacker
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Author added Schomacker
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Local roads and bridges funding provided, and general obligation bonds sale and issuance authorized.
Title
Local roads and bridges funding provided, and general obligation bonds sale and issuance authorized.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Author added Schomacker |
2024-02-22 | House | Author added Wolgamott |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Capital Investment |
Same As/Similar To
SF3605 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration