MN HF3696 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-04 - Author added Youakim.
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-04 - Author added Youakim.
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
GI Bill benefit additional uses authorized, and GI Bill changes made.
Title
GI Bill benefit additional uses authorized, and GI Bill changes made.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Rosenthal [D] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Ron Erhardt [D] | Rep. Dale Lueck [R] |
Rep. John Persell [D] | Rep. Jerry Newton [D] | Rep. John Lesch [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] |
Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | House | Author added Youakim. |
2016-03-30 | House | Author added Fischer. |
2016-03-29 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF3461 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Referred to State and Local Government