MN HF3677 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-20 - Author added Schomacker
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-20 - Author added Schomacker
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Counties authorized to appropriate money for Veterans Day, and limits removed on county spending for Memorial Day.
Title
Counties authorized to appropriate money for Veterans Day, and limits removed on county spending for Memorial Day.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Elkins [D] | Rep. Matt Norris [D] | Rep. Shane Hudella [R] | Rep. Mary Clardy [D] |
Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] | Rep. Joe Schomacker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Author added Schomacker |
2024-03-20 | House | Second reading |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2024-03-11 | House | Author added Wolgamott |
2024-03-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
2024-02-22 | House | Author added Clardy |
2024-02-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State and Local Government Finance and Policy |
2024-02-19 | House | Author added Hudella |
2024-02-15 | House | Author added Norris |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3876 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Author added Carlson