MN HF365 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-12 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-12 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Driver license requirements relating to diabetes mellitus repealed.
Title
Driver license requirements relating to diabetes mellitus repealed.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Laurie Halverson [D] | Rep. Ryan Winkler [D] | Rep. Erin Koegel [D] |
Rep. Steve Elkins [D] | Sen. Kelly Morrison [D] | Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] | Rep. John Poston [R] |
Rep. Kelly Moller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations |
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Moller |
2019-03-07 | House | Authors added Bernardy and Poston |
2019-02-07 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF510 (Similar To) 2020-02-11 - Author added Latz