MN HF3639 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Author added Jordan
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Author added Jordan
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cannabis; health commissioner required to apply for federal Schedule I exemption for medical use of cannabis, and marijuana and nonsynthetic THC reclassified from Schedule I to Schedule II controlled substance.
Title
Cannabis; health commissioner required to apply for federal Schedule I exemption for medical use of cannabis, and marijuana and nonsynthetic THC reclassified from Schedule I to Schedule II controlled substance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Author added Jordan |
2020-03-02 | House | Author added Cantrell |
2020-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3375 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Author added Abeler