MN HF3617 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Author added Bernardy
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Author added Bernardy
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Aquatic invasive species grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Aquatic invasive species grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2022-02-28 | House | Authors added Freiberg; Feist; Xiong, J. and Morrison |
2022-02-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2022-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3748 (Similar To) 2022-03-09 - Authors added Eichorn; Ruud