MN HF36 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Recalled by Chair Taxes
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Recalled by Chair Taxes
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State general tax market value exclusion modified.
Title
State general tax market value exclusion modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Lueck [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Tim Miller [R] | Sen. Steve Drazkowski [R] |
Rep. Jeff Backer [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] | Rep. Sandy Layman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Recalled by Chair Taxes |
2019-01-28 | House | Author added Layman |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred by Chair to Property and Local Tax Division |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF548 (Similar To) 2019-01-28 - Referred to Taxes