MN HF359 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 47
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Flame-retardant chemical use in certain products prohibited, and exemptions allowed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Flame-retardant chemical use in certain products prohibited, and exemptions allowed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - House - House: Passage (Y: 125 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22 Secretary of State Chapter 47
2019-05-22 Governor's action Approval
2019-05-22 Secretary of State, Filed
2019-05-22 Governor approval
2019-05-22 Presented to Governor
2019-05-19HouseReturned from Senate
2019-05-19SenateThird reading Passed
2019-05-19SenateSpecial Order
2019-05-19SenateTaken from table
2019-05-17SenateLaid on table
2019-05-17SenateSecond reading
2019-05-17SenateTaken from table
2019-05-16SenateLaid on table
2019-05-16SenateIntroduction and first reading
2019-05-16SenateReceived from House
2019-05-16HouseAuthor added Wazlawik
2019-05-16HouseBill was passed
2019-05-16HouseThird reading
2019-05-14HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 16, 2019
2019-05-14HouseSecond reading
2019-05-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2019-05-10HouseAuthor added Stephenson
2019-04-26HouseAuthor added Bernardy
2019-03-27HouseAuthor added Cantrell
2019-03-26HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-03-15HouseReferred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
2019-03-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-13HouseAuthor added Claflin
2019-03-11HouseAuthor added Noor
2019-03-11HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Policy
2019-03-07HouseAuthor added Olson
2019-03-07HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy
2019-03-04HouseMotion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Commerce
2019-03-04HouseAuthors added Halverson and Lippert
2019-02-04HouseAuthor added Persell.
2019-01-31HouseAuthors added Lillie, Schultz
2019-01-28HouseAuthors added Loeffler, Freiberg, Hansen, Long, Murphy, Pinto, Youakim, Dehn, and Bierman
2019-01-24HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF321 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback