MN HF3584 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Agriculture and Food Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Agriculture and Food Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Agriculture and Food Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Agriculture and Food Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Companion Animal Board established, duties and responsibilities provided, duties transferred, report required, rulemaking authorized, and money appropriated.
Title
Minnesota Companion Animal Board established, duties and responsibilities provided, duties transferred, report required, rulemaking authorized, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lesch [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Agriculture and Food Finance and Policy Division |
2020-03-11 | House | Author added Gomez |
2020-02-24 | House | Author added Hansen |
2020-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF3481 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Author added Tomassoni