MN HF3581 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-25 - Author added Backer
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-25 - Author added Backer
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tax and fee exemptions on motor vehicles established for volunteer firefighters.
Title
Tax and fee exemptions on motor vehicles established for volunteer firefighters.
Sponsors
Rep. Natalie Zeleznikar [R] | Rep. Krista Knudsen [R] | Rep. Elliott Engen [R] | Rep. Andrew Myers [R] |
Rep. Tom Murphy [R] | Rep. Jeff Backer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Author added Backer |
2024-02-13 | House | Author added Murphy |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4008 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Referred to Transportation