MN HF3577 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Authors added Hornstein, Hausman, Omar, and Layman.
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Authors added Hornstein, Hausman, Omar, and Layman.
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Salt applicator certification program established, and liability limited.
Title
Salt applicator certification program established, and liability limited.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Authors added Hornstein, Hausman, Omar, and Layman. |
2018-03-22 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
2018-03-22 | House | Authors added Anderson, S., and Jessup. |
2018-03-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2018-03-14 | House | Authors added Metsa, Fischer, Poston, and Heintzeman. |
2018-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2018-03-12 | House | Author added Pugh. |
2018-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF3199 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy