MN HF3471 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - House: Author added Ruud
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - House: Author added Ruud
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State Advisory Council on Early Childhood Education and Care duties modified.
Title
State Advisory Council on Early Childhood Education and Care duties modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | House: Author added Ruud | |
2010-03-15 | House: Author added Tillberry | |
2010-03-11 | House: Authors added Sterner, Sailer and Bly | |
2010-03-09 | House: Authors added Rosenthal, Peterson, Ward, Jackson, Lillie, Masin, Greiling, Fritz, Persell, Mullery and Brynaert | |
2010-03-08 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=House&f=HF3471&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | http://wdoc.house.leg.state.mn.us/leg/LS86/HF3471.0.pdf |