MN HF3445 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Psychiatric residential treatment facility service determination and documentation requirement to involve state medical review agent eliminated, per diem rate per youth psychiatric residential treatment services provider establishment required, and facilities or licensed professionals permitted to submit billing for arranged services.
Title
Psychiatric residential treatment facility service determination and documentation requirement to involve state medical review agent eliminated, per diem rate per youth psychiatric residential treatment services provider establishment required, and facilities or licensed professionals permitted to submit billing for arranged services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Second reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee report, without further recommendation re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy |
2020-02-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Long-Term Care Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3291 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Second reading