MN HF3445 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-18 - Author added Schoen.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-18 - Author added Schoen.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Southeast Asian community business development grant program established, and money appropriated.
Title
Southeast Asian community business development grant program established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-18 | House | Author added Schoen. |
2016-04-06 | House | Author added Johnson, S. |
2016-03-24 | House | Author added Fischer. |
2016-03-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF3260 (Similar To) 2016-03-29 - Referred to Finance