MN HF3384 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Author added Dettmer.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Author added Dettmer.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Purchases of equipment for lawful gambling exemption provided.
Title
Purchases of equipment for lawful gambling exemption provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | Author added Dettmer. |
2018-03-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes |
2018-03-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF3384 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Taxes